Williams v. Craddock et al
Plaintiff: Emily Lynn Williams
Defendant: Michael Allen Craddock and Western Express, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2020cv00768
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER:Jury Trial set for 1/20-1/21/2022 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Dispositive Motions Deadline due by 11/8/2021. Amended to update and include other deadlines. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 2/8/2021. (ssm)
February 8, 2021 Filing 12 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendants Michael Allen Craddock, Western Express, Inc. (Miller, Jeffrey)
January 27, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: (CR) Jury Trial set for 1/20-1/21/2022 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. (ssm)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER:Jury Trial set for 1/20-1/21/2022 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs. Discovery due by 11/1/2021. Dispositive Motions Deadline due by 11/8/2021. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 01/27/2021. (ssm)
January 8, 2021 Filing 9 Scheduling Letter (ssm)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Wythe County Circuit Court. Signed by Senior Judge Glen E. Conrad on 12/24/2020. (sln)
December 24, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (aab)
December 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley Walker Winsky on behalf of All Defendants (Winsky, Ashley)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Michael Allen Craddock, Western Express, Inc. (Miller, Jeffrey)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Michael Allen Craddock, Western Express, Inc.. (Miller, Jeffrey)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Requirement to Western Express, Inc. - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (sln)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (sln)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wythe County Circuit Court, case number CL20001835-00. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402. Receipt # AVAWDC 3582012), filed by Western Express, Inc., Michael Allen Craddock. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint and Summons, #2 State Court Notice to Clerk of Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Craddock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Allen Craddock
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Miller
Represented By: Ashley Walker Winsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Express, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Paul Miller
Represented By: Ashley Walker Winsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Lynn Williams
Represented By: Benjamin James Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?