Halter v. Newton et al
Plaintiff: Daniel N. Halter
Defendant: Middle River Regional Jail Authority, Captain Powell, Sgt. Brandon Marshall, Superintendent Jeffrey Newton, VA Board of Corrections and John Lilly
Case Number: 7:2021cv00022
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2021 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and statement of Assets by Daniel N. Halter (aab)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Oral ORDER-It is hereby ORDERED that Halter's motion (ECF No. 5) for an extension of time to comply with the court's conditional filing order (ECF No. 2) is GRANTED to the extent that Halter shall have twenty-one days from the entry of this order to comply with the court's order. The Clerk shall send Halter a copy of the conditional filing order (ECF No. 2), including the attachments thereto. Responses due by 3/22/2021 Entered by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 2/25/2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and statement of Assets by Daniel N. Halter (tvt)
February 12, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed, by Daniel N. Halter. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (aab)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses due by 2/24/2021 Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 2/1/2021. (Order and Trust Account / Statement of Assets forms mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
February 1, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed,, by Daniel N. Halter. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (slt)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account;Statement of Assets; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 2/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 1/15/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against John Lilly, Brandon Marshall, Middle River Regional Jail Authority, Jeffrey Newton, Powell, VA Board of Corrections, filed by Daniel N. Halter. (Attachments: #1 Grievances)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Halter v. Newton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Middle River Regional Jail Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Brandon Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Jeffrey Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VA Board of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel N. Halter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?