Anders v. Russell et al
Plaintiff: Tony Anders
Defendant: Officer Maddy, Captain Keller, Superintendant Bobby Russell, WellPath, David MacDonald, Captain Booker and Major Hayes
Case Number: 7:2021cv00030
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Responses due by 3/29/2021 Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/12/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 Order Prisoner Conditionally Filed by Tony Anders. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (slt)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address by Tony Anders. Updated address: Nottoway Correctional Center, PO Box 488, Burkeville, VA 23922. Clerk updated inmate number #1399956 as well. (slt)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account (DEC); Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 2/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/21/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) by Tony Anders (slt)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Statement of Assets by Tony Anders (slt)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony Anders. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (slt)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Tony Anders. (slt)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Booker, Hayes, Keller, David MacDonald, Maddy, Bobby Russell, WellPath, filed by Tony Anders. (Attachments: #1 Attachments, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Summons)(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anders v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Maddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendant Bobby Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WellPath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Booker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Anders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?