Weaver v. Virginia State Police
Plaintiff: Wesley Clay Weaver
Defendant: Virginia State Police
Case Number: 7:2021cv00036
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT Prejudice. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 3/15/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
March 15, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 3/15/2021. (Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with required prisoner trust account report with six-month statements for July - December 2020 and signed by trust officer within 20 days Responses due by 3/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 2/12/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
February 11, 2021 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) by Wesley Clay Weaver (sas)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 2/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 1/25/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 Statement of Assets by Wesley Clay Weaver (sas)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Virginia State Police, filed by Wesley Clay Weaver.(sas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weaver v. Virginia State Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia State Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley Clay Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?