Sparks v. Russell
Plaintiff: Curtis Eugene Sparks, Jr.
Defendant: Bobby Russell
Case Number: 7:2021cv00037
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Glen E Conrad
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Bobby Russell on 2/23/2021. (Service paperwork mailed to Defendant(s) at Western Virginia Regional Jail, 5885 West River Rd, Salem, VA 24153) Waiver of Service due by 3/25/2021.(slt)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order entered Directing the Clerk to attempt service of process upon the named defendants Bobby Russell re #1 Complaint filed by Curtis Eugene Sparks, Jr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/23/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Curtis Eugene Sparks, Jr (slt)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 3/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/12/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Account Report for December by Curtis Eugene Sparks, Jr. (slt)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account (December); Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 2/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 1/25/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and statement of Assets by Curtis Eugene Sparks, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(sas)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bobby Russell, filed by Curtis Eugene Sparks, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 attachments)(sas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparks v. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Eugene Sparks, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?