Doe v. Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Kathryn Polidoro, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University and Timothy Sands
Petitioner: Non-Party Movant
Case Number: 7:2021cv00306
Filed: May 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristina Julia Hartman on behalf of All Defendants (Hartman, Kristina)
June 15, 2021 Filing 15 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #6 Third Party MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Complaint, Motion for Temporary Injunction, and other documents . filed by Non-Party Movant. (Mirra, Nicholas)
June 9, 2021 Filing 14 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym . filed by Kathryn Polidoro, Timothy Sands, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (McClanahan, Marvin)
June 8, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Third Party MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Complaint, Motion for Temporary Injunction, and other documents . filed by Jane Doe. (Dean, Robert)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Oral ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Responses are due in accordance with the motion. Entered by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on June 7, 2021. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(mf) Modified on 6/8/2021 (mf).
June 4, 2021 Filing 11 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Complaint, . filed by Kathryn Polidoro, Timothy Sands, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (McClanahan, Marvin)
June 4, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #1 Complaint, by Kathryn Polidoro, Timothy Sands, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University. (McClanahan, Marvin)
May 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kay Kurtz Heidbreder on behalf of Kathryn Polidoro, Timothy Sands, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University (Heidbreder, Kay)
May 27, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marvin Hudson McClanahan on behalf of Kathryn Polidoro, Timothy Sands, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University (McClanahan, Marvin)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER For Temporary Seal. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 5/26/2021. (bwd)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 Third Party MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Complaint, Motion for Temporary Injunction, and other documents by Non-Party Movant. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Seal)(Mirra, Nicholas)
May 19, 2021 Filing 5 Electronic Summons Issued as to Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Timothy Sands, #2 Summons Issued as to Kathryn Polidoro)(ams)
May 19, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Virginia Tech, Timothy Sands, and Kathryn Polidoro by Jane Doe (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued Timothy Sands, #2 Summons Issued Kathryn Polidoro)(Dean, Robert)
May 17, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Jane Doe. (ams)
May 17, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under a Pseudonym by Jane Doe. (ams)
May 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kathryn Polidoro, Timothy Sands, Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-3701446.), filed by Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams) (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/17/2021)Replaced deficient/incorrect pdf document with corrected pdf document(ams). Modified on 5/17/2021 (ams).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Polidoro
Represented By: Kay Kurtz Heidbreder
Represented By: Kristina Julia Hartman
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State University
Represented By: Kay Kurtz Heidbreder
Represented By: Kristina Julia Hartman
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Sands
Represented By: Kay Kurtz Heidbreder
Represented By: Kristina Julia Hartman
Represented By: Marvin Hudson McClanahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Robert Edwin Dean, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Non-Party Movant
Represented By: Nicholas Anthony Mirra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?