Eads v. Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Junior Eads
Defendant: Captain Tatum, The Medical Staff, Major Kilgore, Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority and Lt. Mullins
Case Number: 7:2021cv00329
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Motion for Court to get emails and for $25.00/day after August 1 by Jerry Junior Eads. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (slt)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order for Plaintiff to Respond with an Amended Complaint within 21 days. Responses due by 8/16/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 7/23/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Motion to be moved by Jerry Junior Eads. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (slt)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Clerk's Office Response re #12 Letter . (slt)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter regarding status of case and motions by Jerry Junior Eads. (slt)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jerry Junior Eads. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (slt)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Motion for paper emails by Jerry Junior Eads. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (slt)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Motion for Transfer by Jerry Junior Eads. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (slt)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Jerry Junior Eads (slt)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 6/10/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jerry Junior Eads. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (slt)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days Responses due by 6/24/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 6/1/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Account Report by Jerry Junior Eads (slt)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC Section 1983; Regarding Prisoner Trust Account (Trust Account Statements); Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 20 days. Responses due by 6/17/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 5/25/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and statement of Assets by Jerry Junior Eads (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets)(slt)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Kilgore, Mullins, Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority, Captain Tatum, The Medical Staff, filed by Jerry Junior Eads.(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eads v. Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captain Tatum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Medical Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Kilgore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwest Virginia Regional Jail Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Mullins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Junior Eads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?