Pinon v. Kalyan Plaza, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Robert Brandon Pinon
Defendant: Kalyan Plaza, LLC and Roanoke Airport Hotel Partners, LLC doing business as Holiday Inn Roanoke - Valley View
Case Number: 7:2021cv00353
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint, by Kalyan Plaza, LLC, Roanoke Airport Hotel Partners, LLC.(Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance for Susan Childers North by Susan Childers North on behalf of All Defendants (North, Susan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Kalyan Plaza, LLC, Roanoke Airport Hotel Partners, LLC. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kalyan Plaza, LLC, Roanoke Airport Hotel Partners, LLC. (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 9 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Kalyan Plaza, LLC (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Roanoke Airport Hotel Partners, LLC (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Jonathan W. Gonzalez by Jonathan Warren Gonzalez on behalf of All Defendants (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
August 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance of Susan Childers North by Jonathan Warren Gonzalez on behalf of All Defendants (Gonzalez, Jonathan)
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Brandon Pinon. Kalyan Plaza, LLC waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021.(Haddox, Brittany)
June 10, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert Brandon Pinon. Roanoke Airport Hotel Partners, LLC waiver sent on 6/7/2021, answer due 8/6/2021.(Haddox, Brittany)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Kalyan Plaza, LLC on June 7, 2021 by Robert Brandon Pinon. (Service paperwork mailed to Defendant(s) at address provided) Waiver of Service due by 7/7/2021.(Haddox, Brittany)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Roanoke Airport Hotel Partners, LLC on June 7, 2021 by Robert Brandon Pinon. (Service paperwork mailed to Defendant(s) at address provided) Waiver of Service due by 7/7/2021.(Haddox, Brittany)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kalyan Plaza, LLC, Roanoke Airport Hotel Partners, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402; Receipt # AVAWDC-3717506), filed by Robert Brandon Pinon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sln) (Main Document 1 replaced-flattened complaint on 6/7/2021) (sln).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinon v. Kalyan Plaza, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kalyan Plaza, LLC
Represented By: Susan Childers North
Represented By: Jonathan Warren Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roanoke Airport Hotel Partners, LLC doing business as Holiday Inn Roanoke - Valley View
Represented By: Susan Childers North
Represented By: Jonathan Warren Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brandon Pinon
Represented By: Norvell Winston West, IV.
Represented By: Brittany Michelle Haddox
Represented By: Linda Leigh Strelka
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Strelka
Represented By: Monica Lynn Mroz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?