Crawford v. Creative Cost Control, Corporation
Plaintiff: Christian Heath Crawford
Defendant: Creative Cost Control, Corporation doing business as SERVPRO of Roanoke, Montgomery, & Pulaski
Case Number: 7:2021cv00419
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family and Medical Leave Act (FMLA)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou: Telephone Conference held on 3/15/2022. (neh)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Setting Settlement Conference Settlement Conference set for 3/31/2022 09:00 AM in via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 3/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A: Settlement Conference Preparation)(slt)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Order Referring Case to the Honorable United States Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou to conduct mediation proceedings. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 03/09/2022. (ck)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Protective ORDER granting #16 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 1/5/2022. (sln)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Christian Heath Crawford. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Text of Proposed Order))(Haddox, Brittany)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Rule 26(f) Agreed Written Plan by Defendant Creative Cost Control, Corporation (Chapman, Eric)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Status Conference set for 7/15/2022 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Judge Thomas T. Cullen., Jury Trial set for 11/14-18/2022 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Judge Thomas T. Cullen. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.. All nondispositive pretrial motions and issues are hereby referred to the Honorable Judge Robert S. Ballou, United States Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 12/15/2021. (aab)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (sln)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint by Creative Cost Control, Corporation.(Chapman, Eric)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 11/1/2021. (sln)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 11/1/2021. (sln)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Creative Cost Control, Corporation. (Chapman, Eric)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Brief / Memorandum in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Christian Heath Crawford. (Haddox, Brittany)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (sln)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Creative Cost Control, Corporation (Chapman, Eric)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Creative Cost Control, Corporation. (Chapman, Eric)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Creative Cost Control, Corporation. (Chapman, Eric)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christian Heath Crawford. Creative Cost Control, Corporation waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021.(Haddox, Brittany)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Creative Cost Control, Corporation on July 21, 2021 by Christian Heath Crawford. (Service paperwork mailed to Defendant(s) at address provided) Waiver of Service due by 8/20/2021.(Haddox, Brittany)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Creative Cost Control, Corporation (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-3750171), filed by Christian Heath Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(sln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crawford v. Creative Cost Control, Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Heath Crawford
Represented By: Brittany Michelle Haddox
Represented By: Linda Leigh Strelka
Represented By: Monica Lynn Mroz
Represented By: Norvell Winston West, IV.
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Strelka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creative Cost Control, Corporation doing business as SERVPRO of Roanoke, Montgomery, & Pulaski
Represented By: Eric Daniel Chapman
Represented By: James Kenneth Cowan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?