Spence v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ronald Wayne Spence, Jr.
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2021cv00437
Filed: August 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 Scheduling Order,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Robert S. Ballou by Ronald Wayne Spence, Jr. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit prop agreed Amended Scheduling Order)(Matthews, Jonathan)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER:( Jury Trial set for 8/29/2022 through 9/2/2022 at 09:30 AM in Roanoke before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. Counsel must contact the Clerk's Office no later than five (5) business days before the scheduled trial date for your technology needs.), Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/20/2021. (mka)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski: Scheduling Conference held on 9/20/2021. (mka)
August 31, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: (N) (No Interpreter requested) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Scheduling Conference set for 9/20/2021 10:00 AM in via Zoom before Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski. (mka)
August 30, 2021 Filing 7 Scheduling Letter (mka)
August 17, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) - located at Docket Entry #5 State Court Record at page# 12 by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.(sln)
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 Paper State Court Records received from Montgomery County Circuit Court, CL21001058-00, consisting of One Folder. (Paper records available for viewing in the Clerk's Office.) (sln)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requesting Transmittal of Case File from Montgomery County Circuit Court. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 08/12/2021. (sln)
August 6, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (sln)
August 5, 2021 Filing 2 Positive Corporate Disclosure Statement by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate HFT Holdings, Inc. for Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. (sln)
August 5, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montgomery County Circuit Court, case number CL21001058-00 (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402. Receipt number AVAWDC-3760881), filed by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Answer, #3 Exhibit A - State pleadings, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(sln) Docket text was modified to reflect the correct docket entry(sln). Modified on 8/6/2021 (sln).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spence v. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Wayne Spence, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan Kersey Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Represented By: Vincent James Palmiotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?