Board Of Supervisors Of Alleghany County v. Kern
Plaintiff: Board Of Supervisors Of Alleghany County
Defendant: Donnie T.A.M. Kern
Case Number: 7:2021cv00471
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 6 USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening re #4 Notice of Appeal filed by Donnie T.A.M. Kern. USCA Case Number 21-2046. Case Manager: T. Fischer. (aab)
September 24, 2021 Paper supplemental documents transmitted to 4CCA - 1 Thumb Drive submitted (aab)
September 23, 2021 Filing 5 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 4CCA re #4 Notice of Appeal NOTE: The Docketing Statement and Transcript Order Form are available on the 4th Circuit Court of Appeals website at www.ca4.uscourts.gov. If CJA24 form(s) are applicable, you must submit a separate Auth-24 for each court reporter from whom you wish to order a transcript through the District Court's eVoucher system. (aab)
September 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order to Remand Case by Donnie T.A.M. Kern. Filing fee $ 505., receipt# 700069423. (aab)
September 23, 2021 Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to 4CCA re #4 Notice of Appeal (aab)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order to Remand Case to Alleghany County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 9/13/2021. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(aab)
September 10, 2021 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (Notice mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(ams)
September 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Alleghany County Circuit Court, case number CL20-827. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number 700069308), filed by Donnie T.A.M. Kern. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ams)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board Of Supervisors Of Alleghany County v. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board Of Supervisors Of Alleghany County
Represented By: Jim H. Guynn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie T.A.M. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?