Coleman v. Punturi
Petitioner: Joshua Malik Coleman
Respondent: Kevin Punturi
Case Number: 7:2021cv00599
Filed: November 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Thomas T Cullen
2 Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORAL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the next Judge in rotation. Case transferred to Judge Michael F. Urbanski for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas T. Cullen no longer assigned to case. Entered by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 01/10/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(ssm)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order for Petitioner to Respond-Petitioner is DIRECTED to review the factual allegations in the petition for accuracy, make any changes needed, sign the petition under penalty of perjury, and return the verified petition to the court within twenty (20) days of the entry of this order. Petitioner is also hereby DIRECTED to submit with twenty (20) days from the date of this Order any argument or evidence he desires to present concerning the timeliness of the petition under 2244(d). Responses due by 1/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert S. Ballou on 12/23/2021. (Order and copy of petition mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(slt)
November 19, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Joshua Malik Coleman.(tvt)
November 19, 2021 PAID Filing Fee Received $ 5.00, receipt number 7-70078 (tvt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Punturi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Malik Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin Punturi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?