Dean v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Barry W. Dean
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 7:2022cv00490
Filed: August 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Robert S Ballou
Referring Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2022 Filing 6 Electronic Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Attorney, #2 Electronic Summons Issued as to United States Attorney General)(sln)
October 6, 2022 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Issuance as to Commissioner of Social Security by Barry W. Dean (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons as to Office of Chief Regional Counsel, #2 Proposed Summons as to Attorney General)(Goss, John)
August 25, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (sln)
August 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If needed, forms may also be found at #www.vawd.uscourts.gov/forms.aspx Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 08/25/2022. (sln)
August 24, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Barry W. Dean. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sln)
August 24, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Barry W. Dean. Motions referred to Judge Robert S. Ballou. (sln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry W. Dean
Represented By: John Osborne Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?