Archaga et al v. Guillermo Guardado Fiallos
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Archaga and Mauricio Mendoza
Defendant: Guillermo Guardado Fiallos doing business as GGF Drywall doing business as GGF Drywall, LLC
Case Number: 7:2022cv00531
Filed: September 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint #1 Complaint by Guillermo Guardado Fiallos.(Huff, Catherine)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Responsive Pleadings Guillermo Guardado Fiallos answer due 11/10/2022. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 10/11/2022. (slt)
October 10, 2022 Filing 7 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guillermo Guardado Fiallos (Huff, Catherine)
October 10, 2022 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Responsive Pleadings by Guillermo Guardado Fiallos. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Extending Defendant's Time to File Responsive Pleadings)(Huff, Catherine)
October 1, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Luis Archaga, Mauricio Mendoza. (Coffield, Timothy)
October 1, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Luis Archaga, Mauricio Mendoza. Guillermo Guardado Fiallos served on 9/19/2022, answer due 10/11/2022.(Coffield, Timothy)
September 13, 2022 Filing 3 Electronic Summons Issued as to Guillermo Guardado Fiallos NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1Electronic Summons Issued as to GGF Drywall, LLC)(slt)
September 12, 2022 Filing 2 Proposed Summons for Guillermo Guardado Fiallos, d/b/a GGF Drywall by Jose Luis Archaga, Mauricio Mendoza (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons-GGF Drywall, LLC)(slt)
September 12, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Guillermo Guardado Fiallos d/b/a GGF Drywall, and GGF Drywall, LLC (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-4029937.), filed by Jose Luis Archaga, Mauricio Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(slt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archaga et al v. Guillermo Guardado Fiallos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Luis Archaga
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Represented By: Timothy Lawrence Coffield
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mauricio Mendoza
Represented By: Timothy Lawrence Coffield
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guillermo Guardado Fiallos doing business as GGF Drywall doing business as GGF Drywall, LLC
Represented By: Catherine Jackson Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?