Campbell v. Marko et al
Plaintiff: Mary Katharine Campbell
Defendant: MD Nicholas Marko, Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC, Lewis-Gale Physicians, LLC and Nicholas Marko, MD
Case Number: 7:2022cv00639
Filed: November 3, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2022 Filing 6 Clerks Entry of Dismissal with prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) (slt)
December 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mary Katharine Campbell (Smith, Charles)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORAL ORDER:In accordance with Plaintiff Mary Katharine Campbell's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No. [3 ]) and pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), all claims against Defendant's Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC and Nicholas Marko, M.D. are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC and Nicholas Marko, M.D. are TERMINATED as parties in this case. Entered by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 11/22/2022. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(ck)
November 18, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mary Katharine Campbell (Smith, Charles)
November 3, 2022 Filing 2 Electronic Summons Issued as to Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC, Lewis-Gale Physicians, LLC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Please print copies of the electronically issued summons for each defendant as necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Electronic Summons Issued as to Lewis-Gale Physicians, LLC)(sln)
November 3, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC, Lewis-Gale Physicians, LLC, Nicholas Marko (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-4066590.), filed by Mary Katharine Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Marko et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Katharine Campbell
Represented By: Charles Ray Calton
Represented By: Charles Harrison Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Charlie Duane Morrison
Represented By: Charles H. Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Nicholas Marko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis-Gale Medical Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis-Gale Physicians, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Marko, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?