Davis v. Cooper et al
Plaintiff: Tevin Edward Davis
Defendant: Sgt. L. Cooper, Capt. Baitert, Capt. Jonathan Hoffman, Ofc. J. Adkins, Magistrate K. M. Keat, Ofc. Count, Ofc. R. Meridith, Sgt. Lance Cooper, Capt. Brian Bachert and Ofc. Rohan Meredith
Case Number: 7:2023cv00565
Filed: August 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Address and Request to reserve the body footage from the 17, 2023 of the incident of question, along with the incident report and medical report as well by Tevin Edward Davis (Nottoway Correctional Center, P.O. Box 488, Burkeville, VA 23922) (Clerk sending plaintiff docket sheet) (tvt)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. (Notice mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(aab)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #16 Motion for Discovery; the defendants shall respond to the requests for production contained within Paragraph No. 1 of the Motion within 30 days of filing their responsive pleadings. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/16/2023. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(tvt)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Discovery by Tevin Edward Davis. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (tvt)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas John Sanford on behalf of K. M. Keat (Sanford, Thomas)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by K. M. Keat. K. M. Keat waiver sent on 9/13/2023, answer due 11/13/2023.(Sanford, Thomas)
October 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Elizabeth Shipley on behalf of J. Adkins, Count (Shipley, Brittany)
October 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Count, J. Adkins. Count waiver sent on 9/13/2023, answer due 11/13/2023; J. Adkins waiver sent on 9/13/2023, answer due 11/13/2023.(Fessier, Rosalie)
October 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosalie Pemberton Fessier on behalf of J. Adkins, Count (Fessier, Rosalie)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Based on information from the defense counsel (ECF No. #7 ), the clerk is directed to amend the list of defendants on the docket to substitute the defendants' full and correct names, as follows: Sgt. Lance Cooper, (was listed as Sgt. L. Cooper), Capt. Brian Bachert, (was listed as Capt. Baitert), and Ofc. Rohan Meredith, (was listed as Ofc. R. Meridith). Entered by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 10/3/2023. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(aab)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany Elizabeth Shipley on behalf of Baitert, L. Cooper, Jonathan Hoffman, R. Meridith (Shipley, Brittany)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Baitert, L. Cooper, R. Meridith, Jonathan Hoffman. Baitert waiver sent on 9/13/2023, answer due 11/13/2023; L. Cooper waiver sent on 9/13/2023, answer due 11/13/2023; R. Meridith waiver sent on 9/13/2023, answer due 11/13/2023; Jonathan Hoffman waiver sent on 9/13/2023, answer due 11/13/2023.(Fessier, Rosalie)
October 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rosalie Pemberton Fessier on behalf of Baitert, L. Cooper, Jonathan Hoffman, R. Meridith (Fessier, Rosalie)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Sgt. L. Cooper, et al., on 9/13/2023. (Service paperwork mailed to Defendant(s) at Central Virginia Regional Jail 13021 James Madison Hwy Orange, Virginia 22960.) Waiver of Service due by 10/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Cpt. Baitert, #2 Capt. Jonathan Hoffman, #3 Ofc. J. Adkins, #4 Magistrate K.M. Keat, #5 Ofc. Count, #6 Ofc. R. Meridith)(aab)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order entered Directing the Clerk to attempt service of process upon the named defendants All Defendants re #1 Complaint, filed by Tevin Edward Davis. ORDER granting In Forma Pauperis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 9/13/2023. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party and Order/Consent to Fee mailed to Trust Officer via US Mail)(aab)
September 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Consent to Fee by Plaintiff Tevin Edward Davis (aab)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 42 USC 1983; Regarding Consent to Fee; Advising inmate as to 3 strikes rule of PLRA; Assessing a filing fee; Deferring all action in this case; Advising inmate to comply within the allotted time and to notify of changes in address or risk dismissal within 30 days. Responses due by 10/2/2023. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 8/29/2023. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(aab)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report and Statement of Assets by Tevin Edward Davis (Attachments: #1 Statement of Assets) (Print on document appears light and cut off on top.)(slt)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against J. Adkins, Baitert, L. Cooper, Count, Jonathan Hoffman, K. M. Keat, R. Meridith, filed by Tevin Edward Davis.(slt) Document is light in print and appears to be cut off on top. Modified on 8/29/2023-Adding docket text to describe document. (slt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Cooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tevin Edward Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. L. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Baitert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Jonathan Hoffman
Represented By: Brittany Elizabeth Shipley
Represented By: Rosalie Pemberton Fessier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. J. Adkins
Represented By: Brittany Elizabeth Shipley
Represented By: Rosalie Pemberton Fessier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magistrate K. M. Keat
Represented By: Thomas John Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Count
Represented By: Rosalie Pemberton Fessier
Represented By: Brittany Elizabeth Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. R. Meridith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Lance Cooper
Represented By: Rosalie Pemberton Fessier
Represented By: Brittany Elizabeth Shipley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Brian Bachert
Represented By: Brittany Elizabeth Shipley
Represented By: Rosalie Pemberton Fessier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Rohan Meredith
Represented By: Brittany Elizabeth Shipley
Represented By: Rosalie Pemberton Fessier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?