Orellana et al v. Baird Drywall & Acoustic, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nicholas Orellana and Dilmer Acosta
Defendant: Baird Drywall & Acoustic, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2023cv00759
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
Referring Judge: C Kailani Memmer
2 Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JOINT CONSENT ORDER APPROVING FLSA SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 12/12/2023. It is further ORDERED that within 180 days following the date that thesettlement administrator receives Defendants payment as contemplated by the Agreement, thePlaintiffs will file a proposed dismissal order. (sln)
December 12, 2023 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon: Motion Hearing held on 12/12/2023 re #4 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Approval of FLSA Settlement Agreement filed by Dilmer Acosta, Nicholas Orellana. (Court Reporter: Sindie Bragg) (kpa)
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #4 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Approval of FLSA Settlement Agreement : (CR) (#Click on this link for guidance for participation via Zoom and #Click on this link for instructions on how to listen to public hearings) Settlement Approval Hearing set for December 12, 2023 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon. (mc)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 12/1/2023. (mka)
November 29, 2023 Filing 6 Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. #Click here to access the Consent Form (skm)
November 22, 2023 Filing 5 Joint Brief / Memorandum in Support re #4 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Approval of FLSA Settlement Agreement . filed by Dilmer Acosta, Nicholas Orellana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed FLSA Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit Proposed Joint Consent Order)(Coffield, Timothy)
November 22, 2023 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Settlement Joint Motion for Approval of FLSA Settlement Agreement by Dilmer Acosta, Nicholas Orellana. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed FLSA Settlement Agreeement, #2 Exhibit Proposed Joint Consent Order)(Coffield, Timothy)
November 22, 2023 Filing 3 Negative Corporate Disclosure Statement by Baird Drywall & Acoustic, Inc. (Gerrish, Andrew)
November 22, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Shane Gerrish on behalf of Baird Drywall & Acoustic, Inc. (Gerrish, Andrew)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Baird Drywall & Acoustic, Inc. (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402 receipt number AVAWDC-4308521.), filed by Nicholas Orellana, Dilmer Acosta. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A: Consent Forms, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orellana et al v. Baird Drywall & Acoustic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Orellana
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Represented By: Timothy Lawrence Coffield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dilmer Acosta
Represented By: Craig Juraj Curwood
Represented By: Timothy Lawrence Coffield
Represented By: Zev Hillel Antell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baird Drywall & Acoustic, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Shane Gerrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?