Krishchenko et al v. Crosspointe Conference Ctr. et al
Plaintiff: Yelena Krishchenko and Nikolay Krishchenko
Defendant: Crosspointe Conference Ctr., Joey Lyons and LTR Property Management
Case Number: 7:2024cv00295
Filed: May 3, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas T Cullen
Referring Judge: Elizabeth K Dillon
2 Judge: C Kailani Memmer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2024 Filing 13 First RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by Nikolay Krishchenko, Yelena Krishchenko. (Weinberg, Matthew)
June 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORAL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to next judge in rotation. Case transferred to Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon for all further proceedings. Judge Thomas T. Cullen no longer assigned to case. Entered by Judge Thomas T. Cullen on 6/18/2024. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.(ck)
June 14, 2024 Filing 11 Notice of Filing Requirement to LTR Property Management - Pursuant to Standing Order dated May 15, 2000, and the adoption of Rule 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures, effective December 1, 2002, nongovernmental corporate parties are directed to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with their first appearance, pleading, motion or response. #Click here to access the Corporate Disclosure Statement Form. This form should be electronically filed in this matter as ordered. (jv)
June 14, 2024 Filing 10 Brief / Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . filed by LTR Property Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Stanley, William)
June 14, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by LTR Property Management. (Stanley, William)
June 14, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Joey Lyons. (Stanley, William)
June 14, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by William M Stanley, Jr on behalf of Joey Lyons (Stanley, William)
June 14, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by William M Stanley, Jr on behalf of LTR Property Management (Stanley, William)
June 13, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yelena Krishchenko, Nikolay Krishchenko. Joey Lyons served on 5/15/2024, answer due 6/5/2024.(Weinberg, Matthew)
June 13, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yelena Krishchenko, Nikolay Krishchenko. LTR Property Management served on 5/15/2024, answer due 6/5/2024.(Weinberg, Matthew)
June 13, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yelena Krishchenko, Nikolay Krishchenko. Crosspointe Conference Ctr. served on 5/15/2024, answer due 6/5/2024.(Weinberg, Matthew)
May 6, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Crosspointe Conference Ctr., Joey Lyons, LTR Property Management. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to Joey Lyons, #2 Summons Issued as to LTR Property Management)(mlp)
May 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Crosspointe Conference Ctr., Joey Lyons, LTR Property Managment (Filing & Administrative fee $ 405 receipt number AVAWDC-4420903.), filed by Yelena Krishchenko, Nikolay Krishchenko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(mlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krishchenko et al v. Crosspointe Conference Ctr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yelena Krishchenko
Represented By: Matthew James Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nikolay Krishchenko
Represented By: Matthew James Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosspointe Conference Ctr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Lyons
Represented By: William M Stanley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LTR Property Management
Represented By: William M Stanley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?