Francis v. Gilley
Defendant: Warden J. Gilley
Petitioner: Kwasi Francis
Case Number: 7:2025cv00089
Filed: February 7, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: James P Jones
Referring Judge: Pamela Meade Sargent
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2025 Filing 5 Response filed by Kwasi Francis. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Early Response)(aab)
February 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order of Service pursuant to Section 28 U.S.C. 2241 upon respondents re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Kwasi Francis. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/13/2025. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party/Parties via US Mail)(aab)
February 12, 2025 Filing Fee Received $ 5.00, receipt number 7-84071 from Maria Ponce. Receipt provided/mailed to Maria Ponce. (aab)
February 11, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order entered Conditionally Filing this action pursuant to 28 USC 2241; Regarding Statement of Assets; Consent to Fee; or Pay the $5.00 Filing Fee within 30 days. Responses due by 3/17/2025. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Pamela Meade Sargent on 2/10/2025. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party/Parties via US Mail)(aab)
February 7, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kwasi Francis. Motions referred to Judge Pamela Meade Sargent. (mlp)
February 7, 2025 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Kwasi Francis. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents)(mlp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francis v. Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kwasi Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden J. Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?