Andrews v. Smith
Petitioner: Joshua Wayne Andrews
Respondent: Clerk Jacqueline C. Smith
Case Number: 7:2025cv00113
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: C Kailani Memmer
Referring Judge: Michael F Urbanski
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2025 Filing 5 Case transferred from Virginia Western has been opened in Eastern District of Virginia - as case 2:25-cv-00123, filed 03/06/2025. (jv)
March 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order transferring case to Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Senior Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 3/3/2025. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party/Parties via US Mail)(jv)
February 18, 2025 Filing 3 MOTION for Release on Bond Pending Appeal by Joshua Wayne Andrews. Motions referred to Judge C. Kailani Memmer. (aab)
February 18, 2025 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Joshua Wayne Andrews. Motions referred to Judge C. Kailani Memmer. (aab)
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Joshua Wayne Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(aab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joshua Wayne Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Clerk Jacqueline C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?