Ratts v. Commerce West Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Manichahn Ratts
Defendant: John Doe, Mapfre Insurance Company and Commerce West Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv03174
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2018 9 STATUS REPORT Joint by Commerce West Insurance Company. (Roslaniec, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Commerce West Insurance Company. (Roslaniec, Christopher)
November 6, 2018 7 ANSWER to Complaint Amended by Commerce West Insurance Company.(Roslaniec, Christopher)
November 5, 2018 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed by Manichahn Ratts.(Page, Kevin)
October 31, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER ALLOWING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. Pursuant to the stipulation on file ECF No. #4 Plaintiff shall amend his Complaint for the sole purpose of substituting Commerce West Insurance Company for MAPFRE Insurance Company. Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint, naming the proper Defendant, within ten days of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 25, 2018 Reset Motion Hearing as to #4 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 1 Complaint. Motion Hearing RESET TO 11/23/2018 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice to comply with LR 7.1(h)(1). (BF, Paralegal)
October 24, 2018 4 Stipulated MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, Exhibit 1 Complaint by Mapfre Insurance Company. Motion Hearing set for 10/24/2018 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Roslaniec, Christopher)
October 22, 2018 3 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/21/2018 at 9:00 AM before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
September 11, 2018 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (PL, Case Administrator)
September 11, 2018 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mapfre Insurance Company. (Leid, Rory)
September 11, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-2982697 Filed by Mapfre Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Ins. Comm Cert of Service, #4 Exhibit Notice of Appearance, #5 Exhibit Docket, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Leid, Rory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratts v. Commerce West Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manichahn Ratts
Represented By: Kevin Page
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapfre Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher J Roslaniec
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commerce West Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher J Roslaniec
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?