Leitz v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Lisa Leitz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv03036
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John T Rodgers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LR, Case Administrator)
March 1, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Leitz re Commissioner of Social Security. (Tree, D)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals incomplete information. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Case Management Deadline set for 4/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons - General Counsel, #2 Summons - US AG)(VR, Courtroom Deputy)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 3/11/2019. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
February 27, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Lisa Leitz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leitz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Leitz
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?