Cuevas v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Francisco Cuevas
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv03038
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Fred Van Sickle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Peter Phillips on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Jacob Peter Phillips added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Phillips, Jacob)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS Returned Executed by Francisco Cuevas re Commissioner of Social Security. (Tree, D)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(TR, Case Administrator)
March 4, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Francisco Cuevas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cuevas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Francisco Cuevas
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jacob Peter Phillips
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?