State of Washington v. Azar et al
Plaintiff: State of Washington, Deborah Oyer, National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, Teresa Gall and Feminist Women's Health Center
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services, Alex M Azar, II, Diane Foley and Office of Population Affairs
Amicus Curiae: American College of Physicians, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, State of Ohio, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, American Academy of Pediatrics, Institute of Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law, Susan B. Anthony List and Society for Adolescent Health Medicine
Case Number: 1:2019cv03040
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION to Stay re #54 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by All Defendants. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Humphreys, Bradley)
May 3, 2019 Filing 57 LODGED NOTICE OF APPEAL from District Court decision as to #54 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by All Defendants. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number WAIVED. (Humphreys, Bradley)
May 3, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE:A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for 5/23/2019 at 10:00 a.m. via Teleconference before Judge Stanley A Bastian. Participants should plan to call the Court Conference line: 1-888-636-3807 / Access code: 8839796 (No security code) five minutes before the conference. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Magistrate)(EC, Courtroom Deputy)
May 2, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE by All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Humphreys, Bradley)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, granting #18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting #9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator)
April 25, 2019 Filing 53 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanley A Bastian: Motion Hearing held on 4/25/2019 re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Deborah Oyer, Teresa Gall, Feminist Women's Health Center, National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Reported/Recorded by: Lynette F. Walters) (EC, Courtroom Deputy)
April 19, 2019 Filing 52 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
April 19, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Feminist Women's Health Center, Teresa Gall, National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, Deborah Oyer. (Chiang, Emily)
April 18, 2019 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Deborah Oyer, Feminist Women's Health Center, National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, Teresa Gall re Alex M Azar, II, Diane Foley, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Shaeffer, Joseph)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TEXT ORDER: Susan B. Anthony List's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants, ECF No. #48 , is GRANTED. The Applications for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah E. Pitlyk, ECF No. #46 , and Adam Hochschild, ECF No. #47 , are GRANTED. Sarah E. Pitlyk and Adam Hochschild are hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), Susan B. Anthony List's local counsel of record, George M. Ahrend, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (LR, Case Administrator)
April 16, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Susan B. Anthony List. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 proposed Amicus Curiae Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Ahrend, George)
April 16, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Adam S. Hochschild. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3142517. by Susan B. Anthony List. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Ahrend, George)
April 16, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Sarah E. Pitlyk. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3142498. by Susan B. Anthony List. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order)(Ahrend, George)
April 15, 2019 Filing 45 The Amici States' Motion for Leave to File Amicus Brief, ECF No. #43 , is GRANTED. The Amici States' Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #42 , is GRANTED. Benjamin Flower is hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), the States' Amici local counsel of record, Joel Ard, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in the case. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (TR, Case Administrator)
April 12, 2019 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Humphreys, Bradley)
April 12, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by State of Ohio. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ard, Joel)
April 12, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Benjamin M. Flowers. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3140006. by State of Ohio. Motion Hearing set for 5/13/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ard, Joel)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING #38 UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PROPOSED BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE; GRANTING #36 AND #37 PRO HAC VICE MOTIONS. Added Attorneys Madison Condon and Jason A Schwartz for Institute of Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING #34 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE PROPOSED BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE; GRANTING #28 , #29 , #30 , #31 , #32 AND #33 PRO HAC VICE MOTIONS. Added Attorneys Daniel W Richards, Catherine J Djang, Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier, Haley Eagon, Lisa H Bebchick, and Thomas N Bulleit for American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, and Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LR, Case Administrator)
April 10, 2019 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Clare Coleman Corrected re #19 Declaration in Support of Motion, by Feminist Women's Health Center, Teresa Gall, National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, Deborah Oyer. (Chiang, Emily)
April 10, 2019 Filing 38 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Institute of Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 (Proposed Order))(Washburn, Taylor)
April 10, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jason A. Schwartz. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3137614. by Institute of Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed Order))(Washburn, Taylor)
April 10, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Madison Condon. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3137606. by Institute of Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed Order))(Washburn, Taylor)
April 10, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Washburn on behalf of Institute of Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law (Washburn, Taylor)
April 9, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 (Proposed Order))(Washburn, Taylor)
April 9, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Thomas N. Bulleit. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3137043. by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed Order))(Washburn, Taylor)
April 9, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Lisa H. Bebchick. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3137027. by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed Order))(Washburn, Taylor)
April 9, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Haley Eagon. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3137010. by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed Order))(Washburn, Taylor)
April 9, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Douglas H. Hallward-Driemeier. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3136991. by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed Order))(Washburn, Taylor)
April 9, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Catherine J. Djang. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3136977. by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed Order))(Washburn, Taylor)
April 9, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Daniel W. Richards. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3136848. by American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American College of Physicians, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine. Motion Hearing set for 5/9/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed Order))(Washburn, Taylor)
April 9, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Washburn on behalf of American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists, American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians, Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine, Society for Adolescent Health Medicine (Washburn, Taylor)
March 22, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION by Sarah Prager, M.D., M.A.S. in Support re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Feminist Women's Health Center, Teresa Gall, National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, Deborah Oyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Chiang, Emily)
March 22, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION by Heather Maisen in Support re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Feminist Women's Health Center, Teresa Gall, National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, Deborah Oyer. (Chiang, Emily)
March 22, 2019 Filing 24 DECLARATION by Tessa Madden, M.D., M.P.H. in Support re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Feminist Women's Health Center, Teresa Gall, National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, Deborah Oyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Chiang, Emily)
March 22, 2019 Filing 23 DECLARATION by J. Elisabeth Kruse, M.S., C.N.M., A.R.N.P. in Support re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Feminist Women's Health Center, Teresa Gall, National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, Deborah Oyer. (Chiang, Emily)
March 22, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION by Kristin A. Adams, Ph.D. in Support re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Feminist Women's Health Center, Teresa Gall, National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, Deborah Oyer. (Chiang, Emily)
March 22, 2019 Filing 21 DECLARATION by Connie Cantrell in Support re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Feminist Women's Health Center, Teresa Gall, National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, Deborah Oyer. (Chiang, Emily)
March 22, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION by Dr. Kathryn Kost in Support re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Feminist Women's Health Center, Teresa Gall, National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, Deborah Oyer. (Chiang, Emily)
March 22, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION by Clare Coleman in Support re #18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Feminist Women's Health Center, Teresa Gall, National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, Deborah Oyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Chiang, Emily) Modified on 4/10/2019 See Corrected Declaration filed at ECF No. #39 (LR, Case Administrator).
March 22, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Feminist Women's Health Center, Teresa Gall, National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association, Deborah Oyer. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chiang, Emily)
March 22, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION by Kristin Beneski in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1a-1t, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Sprung, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION by Dr. Judy Zerzan-Thul in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION by David Schumacher in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION by Bob Marsalli in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION by Dr. Judy Kimelman in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Sprung, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION by Anuj Khattar, M.D. in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION by Cynthia Harris in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Sprung, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION by Karl Eastlund in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sprung, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Granting #7 Motion to Consolidate; #6 Motion to Expedite, and Setting Briefing Schedule. In Court Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motions for Preliminary Injunction set for 4/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in Yakima, Courtroom 203. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (PL, Case Administrator)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Pretrial Proceedings by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sprung, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Expedite and Set Briefing Schedule on Motions for Preliminary Injunction by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sprung, Jeffrey)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P Humphreys on behalf of Alex M Azar, II, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Attorney Bradley P Humphreys added to party Alex M Azar, II(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley P Humphreys added to party United States Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft))(Humphreys, Bradley)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Marshall Bernie on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Andrew Marshall Bernie added to party Alex M Azar, II(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Marshall Bernie added to party United States Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft))(Bernie, Andrew)
March 5, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint, filed by State of Washington. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
March 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alex M Azar, II. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(LR, Case Administrator)
March 5, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (LR, Case Administrator)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3107729) Filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Sprung, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. Azar et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Paul Michael Crisalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Oyer
Represented By: Sara Zdeb
Represented By: Joseph R Shaeffer
Represented By: Ruth E Harlow
Represented By: Brandon D Harper
Represented By: Nicole M Argentieri
Represented By: Anjali Dalal
Represented By: Jennifer Sokoler
Represented By: Fiona Kaye
Represented By: Brigitte Amiri
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Represented By: Elizabeth Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Family Planning & Reproductive Health Association
Represented By: Sara Zdeb
Represented By: Joseph R Shaeffer
Represented By: Ruth E Harlow
Represented By: Brandon D Harper
Represented By: Nicole M Argentieri
Represented By: Anjali Dalal
Represented By: Jennifer Sokoler
Represented By: Fiona Kaye
Represented By: Brigitte Amiri
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Represented By: Elizabeth Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teresa Gall
Represented By: Sara Zdeb
Represented By: Joseph R Shaeffer
Represented By: Ruth E Harlow
Represented By: Brandon D Harper
Represented By: Nicole M Argentieri
Represented By: Anjali Dalal
Represented By: Jennifer Sokoler
Represented By: Fiona Kaye
Represented By: Brigitte Amiri
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Represented By: Elizabeth Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Feminist Women's Health Center
Represented By: Sara Zdeb
Represented By: Joseph R Shaeffer
Represented By: Ruth E Harlow
Represented By: Brandon D Harper
Represented By: Nicole M Argentieri
Represented By: Anjali Dalal
Represented By: Jennifer Sokoler
Represented By: Fiona Kaye
Represented By: Brigitte Amiri
Represented By: Emily Chiang
Represented By: Elizabeth Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Bradley P Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar, II
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Bradley P Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Foley
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Bradley P Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Population Affairs
Represented By: Andrew Marshall Bernie
Represented By: Bradley P Humphreys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Physicians
Represented By: Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Thomas N Bulleit
Represented By: Catherine J Djang
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel W Richards
Represented By: Haley E Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists
Represented By: Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Thomas N Bulleit
Represented By: Catherine J Djang
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel W Richards
Represented By: Haley E Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Ohio
Represented By: Joel Bernard Ard
Represented By: Benjamin M Flowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society for Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Represented By: Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Thomas N Bulleit
Represented By: Catherine J Djang
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel W Richards
Represented By: Haley E Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics
Represented By: Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Thomas N Bulleit
Represented By: Catherine J Djang
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel W Richards
Represented By: Haley E Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Institute of Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Jason A Schwartz
Represented By: Madison E Condon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Susan B. Anthony List
Represented By: Adam S Hochschild
Represented By: Sarah E Pitlyk
Represented By: George M Ahrend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Society for Adolescent Health Medicine
Represented By: Douglas H Hallward-Driemeier
Represented By: Thomas N Bulleit
Represented By: Catherine J Djang
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Lisa H Bebchick
Represented By: Daniel W Richards
Represented By: Haley E Eagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?