Cave v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bonnie Cave
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv03096
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert H Whaley
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathryn Ann Miller on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Kathryn Ann Miller added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Miller, Kathryn)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bonnie Cave re Commissioner of Social Security. (Tree, D)
May 13, 2019 Filing fee: $100, receipt number SPO034732. (AY, Case Administrator)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND SETTING A PARTIAL FEE. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall pay a filing fee of $100.00 to initiate this action, which sum shall also satisfy any administrative fee. Filing Fee due by 6/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (Attachments: #1 Summons US Attorney, #2 Summons US Attorney General)(AN, Courtroom Deputy)
May 8, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Robert H. Whaley assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Bonnie Cave. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cave v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Cave
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Miller
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?