Sunshine Motor Inn, LLC v. Austin Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Sunshine Motor Inn, LLC and Sunshine Motor Inn LLC
Defendant: Austin Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv03106
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JURY TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/26/2020 09:30 AM in via Teleconference. Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 01:00 PM in Yakima Courtroom 324. Jury Trial set for 10/19/2020 at 09:00 AM in Yakima Courtroom 324. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Minute Entry for TELEPHONIC proceedings held before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson: Scheduling Conference held on 6/25/2019. (Reported/Recorded by: Ronelle F. Corbey) (CLP, Case Administrator)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 by Austin Mutual Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for June 25, 2019, at 09:30 AM before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Austin Mutual Insurance Company.(Lether, Thomas)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Austin Mutual Insurance Company. (Lether, Thomas)
May 16, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3168306 Filed by Austin Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Lether, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunshine Motor Inn, LLC v. Austin Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunshine Motor Inn, LLC
Represented By: Blaine Thomas Connaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunshine Motor Inn LLC
Represented By: Blaine Thomas Connaughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?