Martinez v. Western Heritage Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ignacio Martinez
Defendant: Western Heritage Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv03153
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 Joint Certificate Pursuant to Rule 26 / Rule 16 by Ignacio Martinez. (Miller, Kirk)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk D Miller on behalf of Ignacio Martinez (Attorney Kirk D Miller added to party Ignacio Martinez(pty:pla))(Miller, Kirk)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 10:30 AM before Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand. by Western Heritage Insurance Company.(Bentson, Daniel)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Western Heritage Insurance Company. (Bentson, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Daniel R. Bentson In Support of re #1 Notice of Removal by Western Heritage Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit A part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Bentson, Daniel)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $400; Receipt #0980-3204571 Filed by Western Heritage Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit remainder of Yakima County documents)(Bentson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Western Heritage Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacio Martinez
Represented By: David Burton Trujillo
Represented By: Kirk D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Heritage Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel R Bentson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?