State of Washington v. City of Sunnyside
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Defendant: City of Sunnyside, Christopher Sparks, Al Escalera, James Rivard, Melissa Rivas and Joey Glossen
Case Number: 1:2019cv03174
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Washington re Al Escalera, Joey Glossen, James Rivard, Melissa Rivas, Christopher Sparks. (Riese, Mitchell)
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY MEMORANDUM re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Ehlis, Kirk)
September 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Cancellation (text entry - no PDF document): Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for September 30, 2019, is CANCELLED pending ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss at ECF No. #4 . (MS, Judicial Assistant)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - By Court - Text entry;no PDF document. Oral Argument Requested re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim : LOCATION CHANGE ONLY FROM YAKIMA TO SPOKANE. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2019 at 03:00 PM Spokane Courtroom 901 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 10/2/2019 at 03:00 PM in Yakima Courtroom 324 before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Riese, Mitchell)
August 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Seann M Mumford on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Seann M Mumford added to party City of Sunnyside(pty:dft), Attorney Seann M Mumford added to party Al Escalera(pty:dft), Attorney Seann M Mumford added to party Joey Glossen(pty:dft), Attorney Seann M Mumford added to party James Rivard(pty:dft), Attorney Seann M Mumford added to party Melissa Rivas(pty:dft), Attorney Seann M Mumford added to party Christopher Sparks(pty:dft))(Mumford, Seann)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk A Ehlis on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party Al Escalera(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party Joey Glossen(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party James Rivard(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party Melissa Rivas(pty:dft), Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party Christopher Sparks(pty:dft))(Ehlis, Kirk)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, AND DAMAGES against City of Sunnyside. Filed by State of Washington.(Riese, Mitchell)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 02:30 PM in via Teleconference before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MF, Courtroom Deputy)
August 8, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by State of Washington re City of Sunnyside. (Riese, Mitchell)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of Sunnyside. Motion Hearing set for 9/27/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Ehlis, Kirk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirk A Ehlis on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Kirk A Ehlis added to party City of Sunnyside(pty:dft))(Ehlis, Kirk)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Sunnyside. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Sunnyside ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3225498) Filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Riese, Mitchell)
July 30, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. City of Sunnyside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Mitchell Alan Riese
Represented By: Neal Luna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Sunnyside
Represented By: Kirk A Ehlis
Represented By: Seann M Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Sparks
Represented By: Kirk A Ehlis
Represented By: Seann M Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Escalera
Represented By: Kirk A Ehlis
Represented By: Seann M Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Rivard
Represented By: Kirk A Ehlis
Represented By: Seann M Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Rivas
Represented By: Kirk A Ehlis
Represented By: Seann M Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Glossen
Represented By: Kirk A Ehlis
Represented By: Seann M Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?