Houston Carlson v. Saul
Plaintiff: Carolyn D Houston Carlson
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2019cv03247
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John T Rodgers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by L Jamala Edwards on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney L Jamala Edwards added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Edwards, L)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE by Carolyn D Houston Carlson re All Defendants. (Bothwell, Thomas)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued to General Counsel, Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #2 Summons U.S. Attorney) as to Andrew M Saul.(AY, Case Administrator)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by 10/25/2019. Case Management Deadline set for 10/25/2019. (AY, Case Administrator)
October 15, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers assigned to case. (AY, Case Administrator)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Carolyn D. Houston Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Bothwell, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Houston Carlson v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn D Houston Carlson
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Bothwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: L Jamala Edwards
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?