Gutierrez v. Saul
Plaintiff: Christina Gutierrez
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv03003
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Fred Van Sickle
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Ta Lu on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Ryan Ta Lu added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Lu, Ryan)
January 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
January 13, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Gutierrez re Andrew M Saul. (Brandt, Cory)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(TR, Case Administrator)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
January 3, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Fred Van Sickle assigned to case. (TR, Case Administrator)
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Christina Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Brandt, Cory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gutierrez v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Gutierrez
Represented By: Cory J Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Represented By: Ryan Ta Lu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?