Strocsher v. Saul
Plaintiff: Elizabeth K Strocsher
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv03049
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John T Rodgers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Bennett Watson on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Katherine Bennett Watson added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Watson, Katherine)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elizabeth K Strocsher re Andrew M Saul. (Tree, D)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (EW, Law Clerk)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney, #2 Attorney General)(SG, Case Administrator)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 4/27/2020. (SG, Case Administrator)
April 16, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Elizabeth K Strocsher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strocsher v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Represented By: Katherine Bennett Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth K Strocsher
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?