Dev Bhumi Cold Chain Pvt Ltd v. Yakima Fresh LLC
Plaintiff: Dev Bhumi Cold Chain Pvt Ltd
Defendant: Yakima Fresh LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv03106
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Salvador Mendoza
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NOTICE : Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 08:30 AM via Teleconference before Judge Salvador Mendoza Jr. (Attachments: #1 Consent to MJ Form)(TNC, Courtroom Deputy)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Yakima Fresh LLC.(Monahan, Brendan)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Lynn Wixson on behalf of Yakima Fresh LLC (Attorney Sarah Lynn Wixson added to party Yakima Fresh LLC(pty:dft))(Wixson, Sarah)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan Victor Monahan on behalf of Yakima Fresh LLC (Attorney Brendan Victor Monahan added to party Yakima Fresh LLC(pty:dft))(Monahan, Brendan)
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Yakima Fresh LLC re Yakima Fresh LLC. (Monahan, Brendan)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Yakima Fresh LLC. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
July 19, 2020 Filing 2 CORRECTED DOCUMENT Proposed Summons filed by Dev Bhumi Cold Chain Pvt Ltd Re #1 Complaint. Description: Summons. (Ware, James) Modified on 7/20/2020 to correct event type (AY, Case Administrator).
July 16, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Salvador Mendoza, Jr assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Yakima Fresh, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3508394) Filed by Dev Bhumi Cold Chain Pvt. Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ware, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dev Bhumi Cold Chain Pvt Ltd v. Yakima Fresh LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dev Bhumi Cold Chain Pvt Ltd
Represented By: Dennis Kasimov
Represented By: James P Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yakima Fresh LLC
Represented By: Sarah Lynn Wixson
Represented By: Brendan Victor Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?