Lindsley v. Saul
Plaintiff: Darren Lindsley
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Case Number: 1:2020cv03129
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Mary K Dimke
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Lindsley re Andrew M Saul. (Hatfield, Chad)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Michael Durkin on behalf of Andrew M Saul (Attorney Timothy Michael Durkin added to party Andrew M Saul(pty:dft))(Durkin, Timothy)
August 20, 2020 Payment for Civil Case ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3538283).. (Hatfield, Chad)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals that Plaintiff has sufficient assets to cover the filing fee and the administrative fee. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee. Case Management Deadline set for 9/21/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (PH, Case Administrator)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M Saul. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney, #2 U.S. Attorney General)(SG, Case Administrator)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 8/31/2020. (SG, Case Administrator)
August 19, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge Mary K. Dimke assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul IFP Pending Filed by Darren Lindsley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hatfield, Chad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lindsley v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Lindsley
Represented By: Chad L Hatfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Represented By: Timothy Michael Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?