Sanders v. Western Express Inc
Plaintiff: Richard Sanders
Defendant: Western Express Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv03137
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Western Express Inc. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2020 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Clarence C. Easterday, Jr. in Support of Motion to Dismiss 10.29.20, #2 Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Smedstad, Adam)
October 29, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Change Venue by Western Express Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2020 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Clarence C. Easterday, Jr. in Support of Motion to Transfer 10.29.20, #2 Declaration of Adam C. Smedstad in Support of Motion to Transfer, #3 Proposed Order on Defendant's Motion to Transfer)(Smedstad, Adam)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 STIPULATED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LTR, Case Administrator)
October 7, 2020 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Western Express Inc. Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2020 Without Oral Argument before Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smedstad, Adam)
October 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam C Smedstad on behalf of Western Express Inc (Attorney Adam C Smedstad added to party Western Express Inc(pty:dft))(Smedstad, Adam)
October 1, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Sanders re Western Express Inc. (Haffner, Joshua)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Western Express Inc. (LTR, Case Administrator)
September 1, 2020 Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Western Express, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3549414) Jury Demand. Filed by Richard Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Haffner, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Western Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Express Inc
Represented By: Adam C Smedstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sanders
Represented By: Joshua H Haffner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?