Jimenez v. Service Employees International Union Local 775 et al
Plaintiff: Kristy L Jimenez
Defendant: Service Employees International Union Local 775, Service Employees International Union, Don Clinstman and Jay Inslee
Case Number: 1:2021cv03128
Filed: September 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Thomas O Rice
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kristy L Jimenez re Service Employees International Union Local 775. (Phillips, Sydney)
November 12, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Kristy L Jimenez re Service Employees International Union. (Phillips, Sydney)
November 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael C Subit on behalf of Service Employees International Union Local 775 (Attorney Michael C Subit added to party Service Employees International Union Local 775(pty:dft))(Subit, Michael)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Expedited and Stipulated Motions to Extend Time (ECF Nos. #8 , #9 ) are GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before January 10, 2022. TEXT ONLY ORDER / NO PDF DOCUMENT. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
November 5, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite Hearing on Stipulated Motion to Extend Time by Don Clinstman, Jay Inslee. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Garcia, Mary)
November 5, 2021 Filing 8 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Don Clinstman, Jay Inslee. Motion Hearing set for 11/12/2021 Without Oral Argument before Judge Thomas O. Rice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garcia, Mary)
October 11, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Don Clinstman re Don Clinstman. (Garcia, Mary)
October 11, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jay Inslee re Jay Inslee. (Garcia, Mary)
October 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Kate Garcia on behalf of Don Clinstman, Jay Inslee (Attorney Mary Kate Garcia added to party Don Clinstman(pty:dft), Attorney Mary Kate Garcia added to party Jay Inslee(pty:dft))(Garcia, Mary)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jay Inslee. (LTR, Case Administrator)
September 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Service Employees International Union Local 775. (Attachments: #1 Summons SIEU International, #2 Summons Don Clinstman)(LTR, Case Administrator)
September 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Don Clinstman, Jay Inslee, Service Employees International Union, Service Employees International Union Local 775 ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-3883511) Jury Demand. Filed by Kristy L Jimenez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Phillips, Sydney) Modified on 9/29/2021: Summons filed at ECF No. #1 -5 is blank, attorney notified -- corrected and refiled at ECF No. 3 (LTR, Case Administrator).
September 29, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Thomas O. Rice assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimenez v. Service Employees International Union Local 775 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy L Jimenez
Represented By: Sydney Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union Local 775
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Clinstman
Represented By: Mary Kate Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Inslee
Represented By: Mary Kate Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?