Adkins v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Gloria Adkins
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv03144
Filed: October 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James A Goeke
Referring Judge: John T Rodgers
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Frances Highland on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Erin Frances Highland added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Highland, Erin)
November 16, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by Gloria Adkins re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Dellert, Christopher)
November 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT BY ALL PARTIES TO TRIAL AND ORDER OF REFERENCE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. (LAS, Deputy Clerk)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Stanley A Bastian. TEXT ORDER ONLY. NO PDF ATTACHED.(RG, Chief Deputy)
October 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney, #2 Summons Issued as to Attorney General)(LMR, Case Administrator)
October 29, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Initial Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent or Non-Consent Form. Please Note: Consent Forms are not to be electronically filed with the Court. Return of Consent or Non-Consent is due by the Case Management Deadline set for 11/8/2021. (LMR, Case Administrator)
October 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi ( Filing fee $ 402; Receipt # AWAEDC-3906487) Filed by Gloria Adkins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons SSA, Office of the General Counsel, #3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, #4 Summons Spokane U.S. Attorney's Office)(Dellert, Christopher)
October 29, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers assigned to case. (LMR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adkins v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Adkins
Represented By: Christopher H Dellert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Represented By: Erin Frances Highland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?