Fink v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Carissa Eve Fink
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2021cv03148
Filed: November 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Lonny R Suko
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE by Carissa Eve Fink re Kilolo Kijakazi. (Tree, D)
December 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Ta Lu on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Ryan Ta Lu added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Lu, Ryan)
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (DD, Judicial Assistant)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attachments: #1 U.S. Attorney General, #2 U.S. Attorney)(LTR, Case Administrator)
November 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi IFP Pending Filed by Carissa Eve Fink. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Tree, D)
November 10, 2021 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko assigned to case. (LTR, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fink v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carissa Eve Fink
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Ryan Ta Lu
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?