Lumpkin v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Ralph M Lumpkin III
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 1:2022cv03001
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Edward F Shea
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Arefi on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Kelly Arefi added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Arefi, Kelly)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff is granted in forma pauperis status. IT IS SO ORDERED. TEXT ONLY entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order or notice on the matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (KP, Law Clerk)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph M Lumpkin III re All Defendants. (Goddard, Jordan) Modified on 2/10/2022 Summons does not include signature of Clerk (CV, Case Administrator).
January 19, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Donovan on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi (Attorney Brian M Donovan added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Donovan, Brian)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS WITH LEAVE TO RENEW. Before the Court is Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis. A review of the affidavit of indigency, however, reveals Plaintiff failed to provide pertinent information regarding previous or pending litigation. Within (30) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall proffer the full filing fee, or submit a properly completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Case Management Deadline set for 2/11/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James A. Goeke. (AY, Case Administrator)
January 5, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. (SG, Case Administrator)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security IFP Pending Filed by Ralph M. Lumpkin, III. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Goddard, Jordan)
January 5, 2022 Notice of Judge Assignment. Senior Judge Edward F. Shea assigned to case. (SG, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lumpkin v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph M Lumpkin III
Represented By: Jordan Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Kelly Arefi
Represented By: Brian M Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?