California Bank & Trust v. Shilo Inn Moses Lake Inc et al

Plaintiff: California Bank & Trust
Defendant: Shilo Inn Moses Lake Inc, Moses Lake Food Mart Inc and Kohli Investment Inc
Counter_claimant: Shilo Inn Moses Lake Inc
Counter_defendant: California Bank & Trust
Case Number: 2:2012cv00161
Filed: March 20, 2012
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Office: Spokane Office
County: Grant
Presiding Judge: Lonny R. Suko
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2016 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: SALE OF SHILO INN, MOSES LAKE, INC. granting 224 Motion for Order of Sale. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (AY, Case Administrator)
June 15, 2015 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE SUBJECT TO REOPENING signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (CC, Case Administrator)
January 23, 2015 156 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER RE PENDING MOTIONS - granting 92 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Lonny R. Suko. (CC, Case Administrator)
January 22, 2015 155 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of California Bank & Trust; against Shilo Inn Moses Lake, Inc. (CC, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Bank & Trust v. Shilo Inn Moses Lake Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Bank & Trust
Represented By: Kurt E Kruckeberg
Represented By: Eric David Lansverk
Represented By: Amit D Ranade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shilo Inn Moses Lake Inc
Represented By: Charles Richard Markley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moses Lake Food Mart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohli Investment Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Shilo Inn Moses Lake Inc
Represented By: Charles Richard Markley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: California Bank & Trust
Represented By: Kurt E Kruckeberg
Represented By: Eric David Lansverk
Represented By: Amit D Ranade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?