Newborn v. Colvin (previously Astrue)
Plaintiff: Antonio Newborn
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 2:2012cv03153
Filed: December 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Yakima
Presiding Judge: Thomas O. Rice
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. Judgment entered in favor of Defendant Carolyn W Colvin. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 27 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Paralegal)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING JUDGMENT. The Judgment ECF No. 10 is VACATED and stricken from the record. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiff Antonio Newborn. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newborn v. Colvin (previously Astrue)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Newborn
Represented By: D James Tree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Represented By: Pamela Jean DeRusha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?