United States of America v. Nichols et al

Defendant: Don O Nichols, Terry A Nichols, Last Day Trust, Northwest Investment Specialists Inc, First American Title Company and Spokane County
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2013cv00167
Filed: May 3, 2013
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Office: Spokane Office
County: Spokane
Presiding Judge: Thomas O. Rice
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 6, 2015 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING UNITED STATES MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FORECLOSURE AND JUDICIAL SALE. Granting 46 Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Sale. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
September 25, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION. Judgment entered in favor of Plaintiff United States of America. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
May 28, 2015 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART THE UNITED STATES MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. The United States Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ECF No. 31 is GRANTED in part. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
December 23, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The Joint Stipulated Motion for Dismissal filed by Plaintiff and Defendant First American Title Company ECF No. 19 is GRANTED. All claims and causes of action against Defendant First American Title Company are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice and without fees or costs pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Defendant First American Title Company is terminated. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Nichols et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don O Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry A Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Last Day Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Investment Specialists Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spokane County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alexis Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?