Community Association for Restoration of the Environment Inc v. United States Environmental Protection Agency

Plaintiff: Community Association for Restoration of the Environment Inc
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 2:2013cv03067
Filed: June 28, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Yakima
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Pursuant to the parties stipulation, all claims and causes of action in this matter are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party. The file is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (BF, Judicial Assistant)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 34 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Plaintiffs Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ECF No. 39 is DENIED. The parties are directed to submit a dditional briefing, if desired, on the availability of relief under the Administrative Procedure Act. Cross Motions for Summary Judgment shall be filed by both parties on or before 10/6/2014. Responsive briefing will proceed in accordance with Local Rule 7.1. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR A PROTECTIVE ORDER AND TO STAY DISCOVERY. Defendants Motion for a Protective Order and Motion to Stay ECF No. 21 is GRANTED. Discovery is stayed until such time as the Court directs, after the Courts ruling on t he parties forthcoming motions for summary judgment. Plaintiffs Motion for a Telephonic Status Conference ECF No. 26 is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs Motion to Expedite ECF No. 28 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (LLH, Courtroom Deputy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Community Association for Restoration of the Environment Inc v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Association for Restoration of the Environment Inc
Represented By: Andrea K Rodgers Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?