Troupe v. Washington State Penitentiary et al

Plaintiff: David Troupe
Defendant: Washington State Penitentiary, Linda Belanger, Kevin Walker and Kennith Brodhead
Case Number: 2:2013cv05028
Filed: March 12, 2013
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Office: Spokane Office
County: Walla Walla
Presiding Judge: Edward F. Shea
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2015 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ENTERING RULINGS FROM APRIL 22, 2015 TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING, denying 134 Motion to Compel and Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 136 Motion to Compel; denying 137 Motion to Take Deposition from Defendants. Signed by Senior Judge Edward F. Shea. cc: Mr. Troupe. (SK, Case Administrator)
November 6, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER; granting 47 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Senior Judge Edward F. Shea. (CV, Case Administrator)
May 19, 2014 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF PROTECTION. Signed by Senior Judge Edward F. Shea. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Troupe v. Washington State Penitentiary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Troupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Penitentiary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Belanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennith Brodhead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.