DigiDeal Corporation v. Poydras-Talrick Holdings LLC et al

Plaintiff: DigiDeal Corporation
Defendant: Poydras-Talrick Holdings LLC, Richard Schultz and Shuffle Tech International LLC
Case Number: 2:2014cv00277
Filed: August 19, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Spokane
Presiding Judge: Justin L. Quackenbush
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER RE: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO VACATE - withdrawing 84 Motion to Vacate; withdrawing 82 The Confession of Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Justin L. Quackenbush. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 JUDGMENT (CC, Case Administrator)
September 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS' RULE 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS THIRD-PARTY COUNTERCLAIMS re 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Kuhns counterclaims for frivolous claim, waiver, and laches are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE but remain as affirmative defenses. Signed by Senior Judge Justin L. Quackenbush. (RG, Ops Supervisor)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING STIPULATED MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER - denying 29 Motion for Protective Order Signed by Senior Judge Justin L. Quackenbush. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DigiDeal Corporation v. Poydras-Talrick Holdings LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DigiDeal Corporation
Represented By: Eowen S Rosentrater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poydras-Talrick Holdings LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shuffle Tech International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?