Esquivel v. Zinke et al
Plaintiff: Alfredo Cruz Esquivel and Donald David Willard
Defendant: Ryan Zinke, Bureau of Land Management, Brian Steed, Michael D Nedd, Armando Forseca and Tom Doe
Case Number: 2:2018cv00148
Filed: May 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Office: Spokane Office
County: Ferry
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL ACTION in favor of Defendants. (LTR, Case Administrator)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; granting 31 Government's 12(b)(1) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under the Discretionary Function Exception to the FTCA - the following claims are dismissed with prejudice (a) Trespass/nuisance; and (b) Negligence/Negligent Supervision/Negligent Hiring. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (CV, Case Administrator)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATED MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT; denied as moot ECF No. 9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting ECF No. 16 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting ECF No. 17 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TR, Case Administrator)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: STIPULATION - DENIED as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Esquivel v. Zinke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfredo Cruz Esquivel
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Best
Represented By: Troy Y Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald David Willard
Represented By: Ryan Matthew Best
Represented By: Troy Y Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Zinke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Steed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D Nedd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armando Forseca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?