Brown v. Walter et al

Plaintiff: Jerome Julius Brown, Sr
Defendant: Angela D Caesar, Sheryl Walter, Rushern L Baker, John M Brennan, Hon Sydney J Harrison and Melvin C High
Case Number: 2:2018cv00320
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: Washington Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 28, 2018 4 Featured Case ORDER ADOPTING #2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson (cc: Jerome Julius Brown, Sr. via first class mail). (PL, Case Administrator)
November 5, 2018 3 Mail sent to Jerome Julius Brown, Sr, 7208 Robin Hood Drive, Upper Marlboro, MD 20773 was returned as undeliverable. The envelope had contained ECF No. #2 . (PL, Case Administrator)
October 18, 2018 2 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO CLOSE FILE re #1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT. Objections to R&R due by 11/1/2018 (cc: Jerome Julius Brown, Sr. via first class mail). Signed by Magistrate Judge John T. Rodgers. (PL, Case Administrator)
October 12, 2018 1 RECEIVED COMPLAINT - Receipt # none. No IFP submitted; no civil cover sheet submitted. Filed by Jerome Julius Brown, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Envelope)(PL, Case Administrator)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Walter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela D Caesar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheryl Walter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushern L Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon Sydney J Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin C High
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Julius Brown, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?