Ingram v. Key

Plaintiff: Robert Scott Ingram
Defendant: James Key
Case Number: 2:2019cv00124
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 11 COMPLAINT against James Key (Receipt # IFP Pending) IFP Pending. Filed by Robert Scott Ingram.(PL, Case Administrator) **42 PAGES, PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 3:19-cv-05168. Docket sheet received. **2 PAGES, PRINT ALL** (Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION and Statement of Case to Eastern District of Washington filed by Plaintiff Robert Scott Ingram. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(GMR) [Transferred from Washington Western on 4/15/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Case will be sent to District of Eastern District of Washington - Spokane by electronic case transfer 15 days following the date of this filing. If case is stipulated, the 15 day waiting period does not apply. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001) (ERA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 4/15/2019.]
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE by Judge David W. Christel. The Court orders this case be transferred to the Eastern District of Washington in Spokane and the case be closed. In light of the transfer, the Court defers to the Eastern District of Washington with respect to Plaintiff's #6 Application to Proceed IFP. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001) (ERA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 4/15/2019.]
March 21, 2019 IFP deficiency corrected upon filing of #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. **0 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(SP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 4/15/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED Request for Issuance of Subpoena, filed by Plaintiff Robert Scott Ingram. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(SP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 4/15/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Robert Scott Ingram.**6 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(SP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 4/15/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 SECOND LETTER to plaintiff re IFP deficiency: - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 4/10/2019 to correct. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application form) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(GMR) [Transferred from Washington Western on 4/15/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 SECOND APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Robert Scott Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Transmittal Letter requesting case be re-filed with new evidence)**45 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY**(Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001)(GMR) [Transferred from Washington Western on 4/15/2019.]
March 8, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER mailed re IFP deficiency; - The proper IFP form was not submitted. Enclosed please find the correct IFP form to be filled out in full and returned to the Court. Filer has until 4/8/2019 to correct. (Attachments: #1 IFP Form) **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001) (ERA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 4/15/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Robert Scott Ingram. (Attachments: #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint) **19 PAGE(S), PRINT NEF ONLY** (Robert Ingram, Prisoner ID: 953001) (ERA) [Transferred from Washington Western on 4/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ingram v. Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Key
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Scott Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?