Jackson v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Plaintiff: Kassondra Jackson
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00146
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC shall file it's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by July 12, 2019. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Lockwood, William)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William Gregory Lockwood on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC (Attorney William Gregory Lockwood added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC(pty:dft))(Lockwood, William)
May 3, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3157366) Jury Demand. Filed by Kassondra Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Miller, Kirk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kassondra Jackson
Represented By: Shayne Sutherland
Represented By: Brian Cameron
Represented By: Kirk D Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Represented By: William Gregory Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?