Stone v. Aspen Dental Management Inc et al

Plaintiff: Janet Stone
Defendant: Aspen Dental Management Inc and Adam Mileski DDS PLLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00167
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Rosanna Malouf Peterson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF will issue) granting ECF Nos. #7 , #9 , #11 , Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Graciela M. Rodriguez, Ashley C. Parrish, and Isra J. Bhatty, having applied for pro hac vice status and being found to meet the requirements for pro hac vice membership, are hereby added as counsel for Defendant Aspen Dental Management, Inc. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
June 26, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION by Isra J. Bhatty in Support re #11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Isra J. Bhatty. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3198730. filed by Aspen Dental Management Inc. (Rainwater, Lauren)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Isra J. Bhatty. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3198730. by Aspen Dental Management Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rainwater, Lauren)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION by Ashley C. Parrish in Support re #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Ashley C. Parrish. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3198722. filed by Aspen Dental Management Inc. (Rainwater, Lauren)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Ashley C. Parrish. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3198722. by Aspen Dental Management Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rainwater, Lauren)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION by Graciela M. Rodriguez in Support re #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Graciela M. Rodriguez. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3198701. filed by Aspen Dental Management Inc. (Rainwater, Lauren)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Graciela M. Rodriguez. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3198701. by Aspen Dental Management Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rainwater, Lauren)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT-ONLY ORDER (no PDF shall issue) GRANTING, in light of the parties' consent and for good cause shown, the parties' stipulated motion for an extension of the deadline for Defendants Aspen Dental Management, Inc. and Adam Mileski, DDS, PLLC, to respond to Plaintiff Janet Stone's complaint, ECF No. #4 . Defendants' responsive pleadings or motions are due by July 19, 2019. This text-only entry constitutes the Court's ruling on the matter. Signed by Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (MS, Judicial Assistant)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Rainwater on behalf of Aspen Dental Management Inc (Attorney Lauren Rainwater added to party Aspen Dental Management Inc(pty:dft))(Rainwater, Lauren)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Aspen Dental Management Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson. (Allen, Jaime)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime Drozd Allen on behalf of Aspen Dental Management Inc (Attorney Jaime Drozd Allen added to party Aspen Dental Management Inc(pty:dft))(Allen, Jaime)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Adam Mileski DDS PLLC, Aspen Dental Management Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Adam Mileski DDS PLLC)(VR, Courtroom Deputy)
May 15, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Rosanna Malouf Peterson assigned to case. (VR, Courtroom Deputy)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adam Mileski, DDS, PLLC, Aspen Dental Management, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3166784) Jury Demand. Filed by Janet Stone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Marshall, Toby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. Aspen Dental Management Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Dental Management Inc
Represented By: Graciela M Rodriguez
Represented By: Jaime Drozd Allen
Represented By: Isra J Bhatty
Represented By: Lauren Rainwater
Represented By: Ashley C Parrish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Mileski DDS PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Stone
Represented By: Elizabeth A Adams
Represented By: Toby James Marshall
Represented By: Boyd McFadden Mayo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?