State of Washington v. Azar II et al
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services and Alex M Azar II
Amicus Curiae: Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law
Case Number: 2:2019cv00183
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Bastian
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of Hearing re ECF No. #35 Order Setting Briefing Schedule - Text entry; no PDF document. - By Court: In Court Hearing re cross- motions for summary judgment set for 11/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TR, Case Administrator)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TR, Case Administrator)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 The parties' Unopposed Motion for Entry of Order, ECF No. #32 , is GRANTED. Defendants are authorized to release materials as part of the administrative record, including any information that may be covered by the Privacy Act, 5 U.S.C. 552a. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (TR, Case Administrator)
July 22, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by Alex M Azar II, United States Department of Health and Human Services of filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to the administrative record, #2 Exhibit Certification of the administrative record)(Kopplin, Rebecca)
July 19, 2019 Filing 32 Unopposed MOTION Entry of Order by Alex M Azar II, United States Department of Health and Human Services. Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Kopplin, Rebecca)
July 16, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by State of Washington (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Sprung, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - By Court - Text entry - no PDF document. The Motion Hearing scheduled July 17, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. is CANCELLED per ECF No. 28. (ES, Courtroom Deputy)
July 12, 2019 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT by State of Washington. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER POSTPONING RULES EFFECTIVE DATE; HOLDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION IN ABEYANCE ECF No. #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; granting ECF No. #27 The parties Stipulated Request for an Order to Postpone Rules Effective Date; Hold Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Abeyance. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (TR, Case Administrator)
July 3, 2019 Filing 27 Stipulated MOTION Request for Order to Postpone Rule's Effective Date, Hold Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction in Abeyance by Alex M Azar II, United States Department of Health and Human Services. Motion Hearing set for 7/3/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Kopplin, Rebecca)
July 2, 2019 Filing 26 The Institute for Policy Integrity's Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice, ECF No. #23 , #24 , are GRANTED. Justin Gundlach and Jack Lienke are hereby admitted to practice in the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Washington in the above-captioned case. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(c), local counsel of record, Taylor Washburn, shall sign all pleadings, motions, and other papers prior to filing, and shall meaningfully participate in this case. The Institute for Policy Integrity's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #25 , is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Stanley A. Bastian. Text entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the court order on the matter. (TR, Case Administrator)
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2019 at 01:30 PM in Spokane Courtroom 755 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Brief of The Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Washburn, Taylor)
July 1, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Jack Lienke. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3202579. by United States Department of Health and Human Services. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Washburn, Taylor)
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney: Justin Gundlach. Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0980-3202534. by United States Department of Health and Human Services. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Washburn, Taylor)
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Washburn on behalf of Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law (Attorney Taylor Washburn added to party Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law(pty:dft))(Washburn, Taylor)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #7 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXPEDITE and Set Briefing Schedule on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Stanley A Bastian. (AN, Courtroom Deputy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 DECLARATION by Christopher M. Zahn, MD in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Crisalli, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION by Ellen B. Taylor, Ph.D in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Crisalli, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION by Michael Schaub in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Crisalli, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION by Steven Saxe in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Crisalli, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION by Bill Moss in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Crisalli, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION by MaryAnne Lindeblad in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Crisalli, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION by Mike Kreidler in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Crisalli, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION by Dr. Judy Kimelman in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Crisalli, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION by Cynthia Harris in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Crisalli, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION by Mary Jo Currey in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Crisalli, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION by Paul Crisalli in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Crisalli, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION by Maureen Broom in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by State of Washington. (Crisalli, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2019 at 01:30 PM in Yakima Courtroom 203 before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Crisalli, Paul) Modified to correct hearing location from Spokane to Yakima on 6/28/2019 (ES, Courtroom Deputy).
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Expedite by State of Washington. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2019 Without Oral Argument before Judge Stanley A Bastian. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crisalli, Paul)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Kopplin on behalf of Alex M Azar II, United States Department of Health and Human Services (Attorney Rebecca Kopplin added to party Alex M Azar II(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Kopplin added to party United States Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft))(Kopplin, Rebecca)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Michael Crisalli on behalf of State of Washington (Attorney Paul Michael Crisalli added to party State of Washington(pty:pla))(Crisalli, Paul)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley P Humphreys on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Bradley P Humphreys added to party Alex M Azar II(pty:dft), Attorney Bradley P Humphreys added to party United States Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft))(Humphreys, Bradley)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued filed by State of Washington. (Sprung, Jeffrey)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(PL, Case Administrator)
May 28, 2019 Notice of Judge Assignment. Judge Stanley A Bastian assigned to case. (PL, Case Administrator)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400; Receipt # 0980-3176630) Filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Sprung, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Washington v. Azar II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Washington
Represented By: Jeffrey T Sprung
Represented By: Paul Michael Crisalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Bradley P Humphreys
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Represented By: Rebecca Kopplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M Azar II
Represented By: Bradley P Humphreys
Represented By: Rebecca Kopplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Institute for Policy Integrity at New York University School of Law
Represented By: Jack Lienke
Represented By: Justin Gundlach
Represented By: Taylor Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?